EP1783714 - Signalling of an hazard situation by failure of an hazard monitoring central station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Albisriederstrasse 245, Postfach 8047 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isler, Bernhard Hungerstrasse 36a 8832 Wilen b. Wollerau / CH | 02 /
Scherler, Philipp Sonnenbergstrasse 42 8603 Schwerzenbach / CH | 03 /
Trümpy, Andreas Brunnenhofstrasse 7 8057 Zürich / CH | 04 /
Tüsel, Andreas Im Gütsch 3 8122 Binz / CH | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2008/07] |
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Berg, Peter, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05110377.8 | 04.11.2005 | [2007/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1783714 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/00, G08B29/16 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
G08B29/16 (EP);
G08B25/009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Signalisierung einer Gefahrensituation bei einem Ausfall einer Gefahrenmeldezentrale | [2007/19] | English: | Signalling of an hazard situation by failure of an hazard monitoring central station | [2007/19] | French: | Signalisation d'une situation de danger lors d'une panne d'une centrale de signalisation de danger | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/43] | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10161840 (LUDWIG HORST [DE]) [X] 1,5,7-13 * paragraphs [0009] - [0018] *; | [X]EP1411485 (NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] , [0015] - [0017] - [0023] , [0036]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2005024751 (QINETIQ LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,7-13 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 2 ** page 12, paragraph 3 * |