EP1657080 - Motorcycle tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ravasio, Loic 27 Grand'Rue F-54150, Mairy / FR | 02 /
Desarcon, Jean-Christophe 5 rue de Kockelscheuer L-3323, Bivange / LU | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A., Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 05110405.7 | 07.11.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | US20040987493 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: US 987493 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1657080 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/18 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
B60C11/18 (EP,US);
B60C11/0058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SI [2007/04] |
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Motorradreifen | [2006/20] | English: | Motorcycle tire | [2006/20] | French: | Bandage pneumatique pour moto | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/50] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001158211 ; | [X]JPH08169208 ; | [X]JPH0325003 ; | [X]JPS61211106 ; | [X]JP2000158910 ; | [X]US5225011 (TAKINO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column A; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0653317 (VREDESTEIN FIETSBANDEN B V [NL]) [X] 1,3,6,10 * figure 2; claim - *; | [X]EP0864446 (PIRELLI [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,10 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [XY]DE19812934 (PIRELLI REIFENWERK GMBH & CO K [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * page 2, line 48 - line 64; figures 6-9 * * page 4, line 21 - line 55 * [Y] 7; | [A]EP1066990 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]US6474382 (FINCK FRANCOIS [FR]) [Y] 7 * figure - *; | [X]EP1308319 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0012] - [0032]; figure 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001158211 A 20010612 (OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD :THE) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08169208 A 19960702 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910412), vol. 015, no. 146, Database accession no. (M - 1102), & JP03025003 A 19910201 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870213), vol. 011, no. 048, Database accession no. (M - 561), & JP61211106 A 19860919 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,3-6,10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000158910 A 20000613 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1,3,6,10 * abstract * |