EP1623876 - Camera arrangement for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hunecke, Jens Neuenkamp 7 59505, Bad Sassendorf / DE | 02 /
Kaphingst, Jens Ginsterweg 4 54510, Lippetal / DE | 03 /
Schulte, Michael Finkenweg 11 33106, Paderborn / DE | 04 /
Mühlenberg, Martin Schaphusenweg 8 59494, Soest / DE | [2006/06] | Application number, filing date | 05110596.3 | 06.08.2003 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | DE2002137481 | 16.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10237481 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1623876 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1623876 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/04, B60R1/00, B60S1/08 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
B60S1/0881 (EP);
B60R11/04 (EP);
B60S1/0822 (EP);
B60S1/0844 (EP);
G06V20/56 (EP);
B60R2011/0026 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/46] |
Former [2006/45] | DE, ES | ||
Former [2006/06] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Kameraanordnung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2006/06] | English: | Camera arrangement for motor vehicles | [2006/06] | French: | Dispositif de caméra pour véhicules motorisés | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 05.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03102436.7 / EP1389565 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4329983 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,3,6-11 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 5; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19647200 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1,3,6-11 * column 1, line 34 - column 4, line 56 * * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 3; figure - *; | [A]DE19753879 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 23 - line 54 ** column 2, line 29 - line 54; figure 3 *; | [A]US6170955 (CAMPBELL HUGH [US], et al) [A] 1,5-9,14,15 * column 3, line 42 - column 5, line 13; figures 2,3,5,6 * |