EP1657758 - Method of manufacturing a light emitting diode with molded lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/20] | Light emitting diode with molded lens and method of manufacturing the same | ||
[2014/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lumileds Lighting Company LLC 370 West Trimble Road San Jose CA 95131 / US | [2015/13] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Philips Lumileds Lighting Company LLC 370 West Trimble Road San Jose CA 95131 / US | ||
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Lumileds Lighting U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Road San Jose California 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Basin, Grigoriy Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | 02 /
West, Robert, S. Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | 03 /
Martin, Paul, S. Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | 04 /
Harbers, Gerard Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | 05 /
Smits, Willem, H. Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | 06 /
Hendriks, Robert, F., M. Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | 07 /
Konijn, Huub Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | [2015/13] |
Former [2006/20] | 01 /
Basin, Grigoriy Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | ||
02 /
West, Robert, S. Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | |||
03 /
Martin, Paul, S. Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | |||
04 /
Harbers, Gerard Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | |||
05 /
Smits, Willem, H. Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | |||
06 /
Hendriks, Robert, F., M. Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | |||
07 /
Konijn, Huub Lumileds Lighting, U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Rd. San Jose, CA California 95131 / US | Representative(s) | Rüber, Bernhard Jakob Lumileds Germany GmbH Intellectual Property Philipsstraße 8 52068 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/26] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/20] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05110719.1 | 14.11.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | US20040990208 | 15.11.2004 Original published format: US 990208 | US20050069418 | 28.02.2005 Original published format: US 69418 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1657758 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1657758 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1657758 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/54, G02B19/00, H01L23/00, H05K3/28, // H01L33/58, H01L33/50 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
G02B19/0066 (EP,US);
G02B19/0028 (EP,US);
G02B19/0071 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L33/54 (EP,US);
H05K3/284 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0554 (US);
H01L2224/05568 (US);
H01L2224/05573 (US);
H01L2224/056 (US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01049 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15787 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1815 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19107 (EP,US);
H01L33/46 (EP,US);
H01L33/507 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/056, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73265 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/81 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0555 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0556 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2010/38] | H01L33/54 | ||
Former IPC [2006/20] | H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für eine Leuchtdiode mit gegossener Linse | [2014/41] | English: | Method of manufacturing a light emitting diode with molded lens | [2014/41] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une diode électroluminescente avec lentille moulée | [2014/41] |
Former [2006/20] | Leuchtdiode mit gegossener Linse und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2006/20] | Light emitting diode with molded lens and method of manufacturing the same | ||
Former [2006/20] | Diode électroluminescente avec lentille moulée et sa méthode de fabrication | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12152659.4 / EP2448021 | EP12152678.4 / EP2448022 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2005 | AT | 25.03.2015 | BE | 25.03.2015 | BG | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | DK | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | ES | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | IT | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | NL | 25.03.2015 | PL | 25.03.2015 | RO | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | TR | 25.03.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | IE | 14.11.2015 | LU | 14.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/45] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 14.11.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
BE | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 25.03.2015 | |
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS611067 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6,24-26 * abstract * * figures 1-9 and the corresponding description *; | [X]EP0632511 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,24-26 * column 11, line 47 - column 13, line 54 * * column 18, line 43 - column 24, line 26 * * figures 1, 8-11, 15 *; | [X]US2003089914 (CHEN HSING [TW]) [X] 1-3,6-8,24-26,32,33 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004084681 (ROBERTS JOHN K [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,24-26,32,33 * figures 2-4 * * page 4, paragraph 46 - paragraph 47 *; | [X]EP1460738 (AVALON PHOTONICS AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,6-8,24-26,32,33 * column 1, lines 5-29 * * column 8, line 41 - column 11, line 49 * * figures 2a-3 *; | [X]JP2004319591 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-3,6,24-26* the whole document * | by applicant | JPS611067 | US6274924 | US6274399 | US6576488 | US6649440 | EP1460738 |