EP1645347 - Method for producing a casting of high thermal load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beeck, Alexander, Dr. 516 Spring Island Way Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | 02 /
Ernst, Peter, Dr. Amaleienweg 2 8174 Stadel / CH | 03 /
Fried, Reinhard Stockackerstrasse 3A 5415 Nussbaumen / CH | 04 /
Rösler, Hans-Joachim, Prof., Dr. Lammer Heide 161 38116 Braunschweig / DE | [2006/18] |
Former [2006/15] | 01 /
Beeck, Alexander, Dr. 516 Spring Island Way Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | ||
02 /
Ernst, Peter, Dr. Amaleienweg 2 8174 Stadel / CH | |||
03 /
Fried, Reinhard Stockackerstrasse 3A 5415 Nussbaumen / CH | |||
04 /
Rösler, Hans-Joachim, Prof., Dr. Dorothea-Erxleben-Str. 57 38116 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 05111586.3 | 12.04.2001 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | DE2000124302 | 17.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10024302 | [2006/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645347 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645347 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B22C7/02, B23P15/04, F01D5/18, B22C9/04 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
B22C7/023 (EP,US);
B22C7/02 (EP,US);
B22C9/04 (EP,US);
B22C9/043 (EP,US);
F01D5/18 (EP,US);
F01D5/183 (EP,US);
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2230/211 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines thermisch belasteten Gussteils | [2006/15] | English: | Method for producing a casting of high thermal load | [2006/15] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une pièce moulée à charge thermique élevée | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01109115.4 / EP1155760 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Request for further processing for: | 28.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1377648 (PENNY R N) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US4422229 (SADLER JOHN H R [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5253976 (CUNHA FRANCISCO J [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 43 - line 52; figures 4,5 * * column 7, line 38 - line 52 *; | [A]GB2310896 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-14 * page 8, line 7 - line 26; figures 1,2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5690473 (KERCHER DAVID MAX [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | US3690367 | US3763926 | DE3203869 | US4653983 | EP0132667 | DE3235230 | DE4328401 | EP0749790 |