EP1667373 - Mitigating interference problems in a wireless network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/23] | Protocol for exchanging control data to mitigate interference problems in a wireless network | ||
[2011/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2014/29] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abhishek, Abhishek c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way WA Washington 98052, Redmond / US | 02 /
Madhavan, Poovanpilli G. c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way WA Washington 98052, Redmond / US | 03 /
Poncini, Victoria M. c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way WA Washington 98052, Redmond / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05111639.0 | 02.12.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | US20040004428 | 03.12.2004 Original published format: US 4428 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667373 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667373 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/00 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04B1/10 (KR);
H04B15/00 (KR);
H04B15/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | H04L12/28, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | Verringerung von Interferenzproblemen in einem drahtlosen Netz | [2011/11] | English: | Mitigating interference problems in a wireless network | [2011/12] | French: | Réduiction des problèmes d'interférence dans un réseau sans fil | [2011/11] |
Former [2006/23] | Protokol zum Austauschen von Steuerungsdaten zur Verringerung von Interferenzproblemen in einem drahtlosen Netz | ||
Former [2006/23] | Protocol for exchanging control data to mitigate interference problems in a wireless network | ||
Former [2006/23] | Protocol pour échanger données de contrôle pour réduire les problèmes d'interférence dans un réseau sans fil | Examination procedure | 05.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2005 | AT | 16.07.2014 | BE | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | ES | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | IT | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | IE | 02.12.2014 | LU | 02.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 02.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004022223 (BILLHARTZ THOMAS JAY [US]) [A] 1-37* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] *; | [A]US2004054774 (BARBER SIMON [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] *; | [X]WO2004077724 (BACKES FLOYD [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,12,13,20-24,28-31,33 * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 4 * * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 13 * * page 14, line 10 - line 21 * * figures 1,3,14,16 * | Examination | US2004203474 | by applicant | WO2004077724 | US2004203474 |