08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
08.07.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
03.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
16.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
22.05.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
20.03.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
13.06.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] |
06.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.06.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.01.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.03.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2011 |
Change - English title |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
11.02.2011 |
Change - German title |
published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
11.02.2011 |
Change - English title |
published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
11.02.2011 |
Change - French title |
published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
17.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.07.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
09.07.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
17.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.05.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.01.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
05.01.2007 |
First examination report |
|
03.01.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
05.05.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |