Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7463592 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2008 | B2 | US2006120302 | 08.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US442804 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101159351B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2012 | B1 | KR20060063702 | 12.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US442804 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4974518B | Global Dossier | 11.07.2012 | B2 | JP2006186993 | 13.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US442804 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1667373 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2014 | B1 | EP1667373 | 07.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US442804 | 03.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1791109B | 16.01.2013 | B | CN1791109 | 21.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US442804 | 03.12.2004 |