EP1798726 - Methods and apparatuses for writing data, for reading data, and for administrating data carrier errors; and data carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winter, Marco Böhmerstr. 17 30173, Hannover / DE | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Thies, Stephan Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Thies, Stephan Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, European Patent Operations, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 05112338.8 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1798726 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B20/12 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
G11B20/1883 (EP);
G11B20/1251 (EP);
G11B2020/10944 (EP);
G11B2020/1222 (EP);
G11B2020/1285 (EP);
G11B2020/1297 (EP);
G11B2020/183 (EP);
G11B2020/1896 (EP);
G11B2220/20 (EP);
G11B2220/2537 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/09] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zum Schreiben und Lesen von Daten, zur Verwaltung von Datenträgerfehlern und Datenträger | [2007/25] | English: | Methods and apparatuses for writing data, for reading data, and for administrating data carrier errors; and data carriers | [2007/25] | French: | Procédés et appareils d'écriture de données, de lecture de données et d'administration d'erreurs de supports de données, et supports de données | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001043805 (NAKATANI TOKUO [JP], et al) [X] 2,25 * paragraph [0147] * * paragraphs [0345] - [0392] * * figures 36-38 *; | [XY]EP1164590 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 5-8,15-18,25 * paragraph [0040] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0065] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0085] * * figures 1,2,6 * [Y] 17-23; | [XA]US2002144186 (ITO MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 15,16 * paragraphs [0070] - [0084] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 5-8; | [Y]US2002152349 (KAGEYAMA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 9,23 * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] *; | [X]US2002168180 (TOL RONALD MARCEL [NL], et al) [X] 5,8,15,16,25 * paragraphs [0039] - [0053] * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2005228940 (BLACQUIERE JOHANNIS FRISO REND [NL], et al) [X] 24 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0026] , [0029] - [0034] * * figures 1-4 *; | [XY] - "DIRECTORY STRUCTURE AND DATA LAYOUT FOR THE EFFICIENT WRITING AND READING OF DATA ON 12 WRITE-ONCE READ-MANY OPTICAL DISK MEDIA", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19920301), vol. 34, no. 10B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 459 - 466, XP000302807 [X] 1,2,10,11,13,25 * the whole document * [Y] 9,12,14 | [Y] - MCFERRIN B (EDITOR), INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - MULTIMEDIA COMMANDS - 4 (MMC-4), Revision 3d, INCITS WORKING DRAFT, XX, XX, PAGE(S) COMPLETE, (20040915), XP002357139 [Y] 12,14,17-22 * pages 109-113 * * pages 429-432 * | [A] - ECMA, "Volume and File Structure for Write-Once and Rewritable Media using Non-Sequential Recording for Information Interchange, 3rd edition", STANDARD ECMA-167, (199706), XP002155419 [A] 1,2,25 * pages 26,38,69 * |