EP1800559 - Link comprising a casing with a lower plate and upper plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Management Services AG Seevorstadt 6 Postfach 2501 Biel/Bienne / CH | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loetscher, Philippe Chemin des Bourdons 15 2533 Evilard / CH | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | ||
Former [2007/26] | Robert, Vincent, et al ICB S.A. Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 05112902.1 | 23.12.2005 | [2007/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1800559 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1800559 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/14 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A44C5/14 (EP,US);
A44C5/00 (KR);
G04B37/1486 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4718 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4782 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Verbindung enthaltend ein Befestigungsgehäuse mit unterer Platte und oberer Platte | [2007/26] | English: | Link comprising a casing with a lower plate and upper plate | [2007/26] | French: | Lien comportant un carter de fixation formé d'une plaque et d'une contre-plaque | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 18.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2008 | CY | 08.10.2008 | CZ | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | EE | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | IE | 08.10.2008 | LT | 08.10.2008 | LV | 08.10.2008 | NL | 08.10.2008 | PL | 08.10.2008 | RO | 08.10.2008 | SI | 08.10.2008 | SK | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | LU | 23.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | BG | 08.01.2009 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | ES | 19.01.2009 | IS | 08.02.2009 | PT | 17.02.2009 | HU | 09.04.2009 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CY | 08.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
TR | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
HU | 09.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 08.10.2008 | |
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | SI | 08.10.2008 | |
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 08.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3908243 (LOU WO JOAA, et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 1 - line 23; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO8400285 (WEICK HEINZ HERMANN) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]EP0397548 (CHANEL [FR]) [A] 1-16 * column 3; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0494584 (S C S & CO S R L [IT]) [A] 1-9* column 3, line 8 - line 48; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]CH689369 (HIRSCH ARMBAENDER [AT]) [DA] 1-16 * column 1 - column 2 * * column 14, line 26 - line 65; figures 12-14 * |