EP1679937 - Wireless output system for audio/video equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDT Sonicvision Limited 9th Floor, Block C Phase 1, Kaiser Estate 41 Man Yue Street Hunghom Kownloon, Hong Kong / CN | [2006/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chan, Raymond, 9th Floor, Block C Phase 1,Kaiser Estate 41 Man Yue Street Hunghom, Kowloon, Hong Kong SAR / CN | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk 43 Park Place Leeds LS1 2RY / GB | ||
Former [2007/51] | White, Nicholas John, et al Marks & Clerk 43 Park Place Leeds LS1 2RY / GB | ||
Former [2006/28] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin, et al Marks & Clerk 43 Park Place GB-Leeds LS1 2RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250029.5 | 06.01.2005 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1679937 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04R5/02 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
H04R3/00 (EP);
H04R2420/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Title | German: | Drahtloses Ausgabesystem für Audio/Video Einrichtungen | [2006/28] | English: | Wireless output system for audio/video equipment | [2006/28] | French: | Système de sortie sans fil pour équipement audio/vidéo | [2006/28] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 02.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/12] | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/12] | Request for further processing for: | 01.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 01.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6329908 (FRECSKA SANDOR A [US]) [A] 5 * column 4, line 2 - line 3 *; | [A]US6385322 (MIETLING ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 10* figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2002160722 (TERRANOVA DOMENIC F [US], et al) [A] 4 * paragraph [0090] *; | [A]US6487296 (ALLEN STEVEN W [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 6 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 62 *; | [X]US2004234088 (MCCARTY WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0030] - [0033] - [0052] - [0091] - [0093] - [0101] - [0106]; claims 1-46 *; | [X]US2004247139 (WANG RANDALL [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0027] * |