Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7216589 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2007 | B2 | US2005183605 | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76644904 | 27.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101193822B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2012 | B1 | KR20050077265 | 01.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US76644904 | 27.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4652831B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | B2 | JP2005214619 | 11.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US76644904 | 27.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1559986 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2008 | B1 | EP1559986 | 03.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76644904 | 27.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005006632D1 | 26.06.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US76644904 | 27.01.2004 |