EP1553755 - Color printing by replacing chromatic black dots with monochrome black dots [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yao, Meng 2925 White Salmon Street West Linn, OR 97068 / US | 02 /
Parker, Mark R. 3615 Ne Hassalo Portland Oregon 97232 / US | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250107.9 | 11.01.2005 | [2005/28] | Priority number, date | US20040756586 | 12.01.2004 Original published format: US 756586 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553755 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553755 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
H04N1/6022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/14] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Farbdruckverfahren das schwarze chromatische Druckpunkte durch monochromatische schwarze Druckpunkte ersetzt | [2005/28] | English: | Color printing by replacing chromatic black dots with monochrome black dots | [2005/28] | French: | Méthode d'impression en couleur qui replace des points noires chromatiques par des points noires achromatiques | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2007 | 29.08.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0583127 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 21 - line 24 * * column 5, line 24 - line 26 * * column 5, line 46 - line 56 * * column 6, line 10 - line 21 * * column 5, line 38 - line 40 * * column 6, line 48 - line 50 * * column 6, line 23 - line 24 * [Y] 2-6; | [Y]US2002176105 (KAWAI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0183] ** paragraph [0011] *; | [Y]US2003202193 (YOKOCHI ATSUSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0147] * |