EP1555793 - Stateful push notifications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Openwave Systems Inc. 1400 Seaport Boulevard, Office no. W4152 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wills, Fergus M. 22 Broughton Gardens Belfast, Co. Antrim, N. Ireland BT6 0BB / GB | 02 /
McTavish, David J. 104 Upper Newtownards Road Belfast, Co. Antrim, N. Ireland BT4 3EN / GB | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Butler, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250162.4 | 14.01.2005 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | US20040537301P | 15.01.2004 Original published format: US 537301 P | US20040026675 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: US 26675 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1555793 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1555793 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (EP,US);
H04L67/561 (EP,US);
H04L67/564 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L61/45 (EP,US);
H04L67/142 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2006/40] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stateful-Pushanzeige | [2005/29] | English: | Stateful push notifications | [2005/29] | French: | Notification avec état associé | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.09.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003101246 (LAHTI JERRY [FI]) [X] 1-6,10-18,20 * abstract * * figures 1,3,5,6 * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0028] , [0029] , [0036] - [0042] - [0052] , [0056] - [0059] *; | [X]EP1345456 (OPENWAVE SYS INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10-18,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0019] , [0024] , [0030] , [0031] , [0040] , [0041] , [0044] * * claim 27 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X] - WIRELESS APPLICATION PROTOCOL FORUM, "WAP Push Architectural Overview", WAP FORUM, (19991108), XP002183436 [X] 1-6,10-18,20 * Points 5, 6, 7.2, 7.6, 8, 9, 11 and 12 * | [A] - "Push Proxy Gateway Service passage", PUSH PROXY GATEWAY SERVICE, (20010713), pages 1 - 20, XP002270966 [A] 10 * Point 6 * |