EP1557841 - Multilevel Resistive Memory device and its writing erasing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsushima, Tomohito, Sony Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
Aratani, Katsuhisa, Sony Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
Kouchiyama, Akira, Sony Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/30] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250263.0 | 19.01.2005 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | JP20040012288 | 20.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004012288 | JP20040124543 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004124543 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1557841 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1557841 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1557841 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/56, G11C16/02 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
G11C11/5685 (EP,US);
E03F5/06 (KR);
E03F5/0401 (KR);
G11C11/5614 (EP,US);
G11C13/0007 (EP,US);
G11C13/0011 (EP,US);
G11C13/0069 (EP,US);
G11C13/0097 (EP,US);
E03F2005/066 (KR);
G11C2013/0071 (EP,US);
G11C2213/32 (EP,US);
G11C2213/34 (EP,US);
G11C2213/79 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/27] |
Former [2005/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Resistiver Multibitspeicher und Schreib-Lösch-Verfahren zu dessen Anwendung | [2005/30] | English: | Multilevel Resistive Memory device and its writing erasing method | [2005/30] | French: | Mémoire multiniveau resistive et méthode d'écriture-effacement associée | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO02091385 (COATUE CORP [US]) [X] 1,6-8 * figures 4,6 * * pages 11,14 * [Y] 1,6-8; | [XY]US2003035314 (KOZICKI MICHAEL N [US]) [X] 1,6-8 * paragraphs [0051] - [0062]; figure 7 * [Y] 1,6-8; | [PX]EP1426972 (SHARP KK [JP]) [PX] 1,6 * paragraphs [0020] , [0025] , [0035] , [0036] , [0043] , [0044]; figures 3,7,8,12b; claims 2-4 *; | [PA]EP1486985 (SHARP KK [JP]) [PA] 1-5 * figures 8-12 ** paragraphs [0028] - [0034] *; | [Y] - BECK A ET AL, "Reproducible switching effect in thin oxide films for memory applications", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20000703), vol. 77, no. 1, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 139 - 141, XP012025998 [Y] 6-8 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.126902 |