EP1586739 - Thermal shield for a gas turbine airfoil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Ching-Pang 12 Camargo Pines Lane Cincinnati, OH 45243 / US | 02 /
Bunker, Ronald 1354 Rowe Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250406.5 | 26.01.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | US20040824922 | 15.04.2004 Original published format: US 824922 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1586739 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hitzeschild für eine Gasturbinen-Schaufel | [2005/42] | English: | Thermal shield for a gas turbine airfoil | [2005/42] | French: | Bouclier thermique pour aube de turbine à gaz | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 28.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |