EP1564530 - Optical encoder for detection of rotary and axial movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Tomohiko 1770-1, Kawaguchi, Fujikawaguchiko-machi Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0304 / JP | 02 /
Taniguchi, Mitsuyuki 1158-11, Kawashimata Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka, 412-0045 / JP | 03 /
Oda, Takayuki c/o Room 12-204, FANUC Manshonharimomi, 3513, Shibokusa, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0511 / JP | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250532.8 | 01.02.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | JP20040026966 | 03.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004026966 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1564530 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/347 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G01D5/3473 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/19] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Geber zur Detektion von Rotations- und Axialbewegungen | [2005/33] | English: | Optical encoder for detection of rotary and axial movement | [2005/33] | French: | Codeur optique pour detecter des mouvements rotatifs et axiaux | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61223613 ; | [XY]US4476457 (KONDO SHIROH [JP]) [X] 1 [Y] 1-6; | [Y]US4833405 (RICHARDS PAUL N [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, lines 55-66 * * column 7, lines 24-27 *; | [A]US5448924 (NAGAI YATARO [JP], et al)[A] 1-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870221), vol. 011, no. 058, Database accession no. (P - 550), & JP61223613 A 19861004 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |