EP1562317 - Transmission/reception system, apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Toshiharu c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/32] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr., et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250595.5 | 03.02.2005 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | JP20040030402 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004030402 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1562317 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1562317 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H03M13/11, H03M13/37 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H03M13/3761 (EP,US);
H03M13/6306 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H03M13/1515 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0093 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/32] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/07] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System, Gerät und Verfahren zum Senden und Empfangen | [2005/32] | English: | Transmission/reception system, apparatus and method | [2005/32] | French: | Système, dispositif et procédé de transmission et de réception | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 07.12.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.01.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002190878 (LUBY MICHAEL G [US]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0102]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0123] *; | [I] - JOHN W BYERS ET AL, "A Digital Fountain Approach to Asynchronous Reliable Multicast", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20021001), vol. 20, no. 8, ISSN 0733-8716, XP011065538 [I] 1-25 * abstract * * section V * | [A] - LUBY/DIGITAL FOUNTAIN L VICISANO/CISCO L RIZZO/U OF PISA J GEMMELL/MICROSOFT J CROWCROFT/UCL B LUECKENHOFF/CADENCE M, "Reliable Multicast Transport Building Block: Forward Error Correction Codes; draft-ietf-rmt-bb-fec-01.txt", 20000713, (20000713), vol. rmt, no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015026517 [A] 1-25 * section 2.3 page 10 section 3 on pages 14 and 15. * | [A] - PARK K ET AL, "QoS-sensitive transport of real-time MPEG video using adaptive redundancy control", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010101), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0140-3664(00)00291-7, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 78 - 92, XP004227543 [A] 1-25 * section 5.1.2. figures 4 and 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-3664(00)00291-7 | by applicant | - JOHN W. BYERS ET AL., "A Digital Fountain Approach to Asynchronous Reliable Multicast", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (200210), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 1528 - 1540 |