EP1569320 - Interior rotor motor comprising embedded permanent magnets and method of determing the ratio of stator to rotor poles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 15-1, 1-chome, Kitaotsuka, Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 15-1, 1-chome, Kitaotsuka, Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyashita, Toshihito Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 15-2, Kitaotsuka 1-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Onodera, Satoru Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 15-1, Kitaotsuka 1-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2005/35] | Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250661.5 | 04.02.2005 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | JP20040028515 | 04.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004028515 | JP20040194149 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004194149 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1569320 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1569320 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K21/14, H02K29/03 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H02K29/03 (EP,KR,US);
H02K1/2706 (KR);
H02K15/03 (KR);
H02K21/14 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/35] | H02K1/27 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/05] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Innerer Läufer mit eingebetteten Dauermagneten und Methode zum Bestimmen des Verhältnisses von Stator- zu Rotorpolen | [2005/35] | English: | Interior rotor motor comprising embedded permanent magnets and method of determing the ratio of stator to rotor poles | [2005/35] | French: | Rotor intérieur aux aimants permanents encastrés et méthode de détermination de la relation des pôles statoriques et rotoriques | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 25.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003319584 ; | [X]JP2002315243 ; | [PX]JP2004056871 ; | [Y]EP0909009 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4,7 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0048]; figures 6,8 *; | [A]EP0991166 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 2,3,5,6,8,9,11* the whole document *; | [Y]US6208054 (TAJIMA FUMIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4,7 * column 6, line 23 - column 7, line 47 * * column 9, line 36 - column 10, line 50; figures 1-3,8 *; | [X]WO0235683 (NIHON RIKEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 3,9 * abstract *; | [X]EP1265338 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [X] 2 * column 6, line 6 - line 58; figures 2-4 *; | [XA]DE10219332 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 2,5 * the whole document * [A] 11; | [X]EP1296437 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 2,5 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO03085807 (WAVECREST LAB LLC [US]) [Y] 1 * page 8, line 24 - page 11, line 5; figures 1-3,8 *; | [A]US2004017123 (MIYASHITA TOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [A] 7 * page 3, paragraph 37 - page 6, paragraph 73; figures 1,2,4-6 *; | [PX]EP1487089 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [PX] 1 * page 4, line 15 - page 6, column 36; figures 1-4 *; | [A] - KRASSER, B., Optimierte Auslegung einer Modularen Dauermagnetmaschine für ein autarkes Hybridfahrzeug, Kapitel 2, BIBLIOTHEK DER TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITÄT MÜNCHEN, GERMANY, (20000920), XP002355117 [A] 1-9 * page 6 - page 11; figures 2.1-2.6 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003319584 A 20031107 (TOYODA MACH WORKS LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030205), vol. 2003, no. 02, & JP2002315243 A 20021025 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 2,5 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004056871 A 20040219 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [PX] 3,9 * abstract * |