EP1564687 - Method and apparatus for high speed visualization of depth image-based 3D graphic data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Inkyu Hitech Center 509 253 Yonghyun-dong Nam-gu Incheon 402-751 / KR | 02 /
Han, Jooyeon 110-1003 Eunvit Apt. 1255 Sanggye 1-dong Nowon-gu, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jang, Gyeongja 207-1403 Byucksan Apt. 832-1 Jukjeon-dong Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Jung, Seokyoon 327-1101 Jamwon Hansin Apt. 52-2 Jamwon-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | 05 /
Kim, Keunho 561-35 Gongneung 1-dong Nowon-gu, Seoul / KR | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/33] | 01 /
Park, Inkyu 208-1505 Woosung Apt. 105 Sadang 2-dong Dongjak-gu, Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Han, Jooyeon 110-1003 Eunvit Apt. 1255 Sanggye 1-dong Nowon-gu, Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Jang, Gyeongja 207-1403 Byucksan Apt. 832-1 Jukjeon-dong Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Jung, Seokyoon 327-1101 Jamwon Hansin Apt. 52-2 Jamwon-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | |||
05 /
Kim, Keunho 561-35 Gongneung 1-dong Nowon-gu, Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250685.4 | 07.02.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | KR20040008741 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: KR 2004008741 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1564687 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1564687 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/10 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G06T15/10 (EP,US);
D06Q1/10 (KR);
D04D9/06 (KR);
G06T15/04 (EP,US);
G06T15/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/12] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Visualisierung der tiefbildbasierenden 3D grafischen Daten mit hoher Geschwindigkeit | [2005/33] | English: | Method and apparatus for high speed visualization of depth image-based 3D graphic data | [2005/33] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour visualisation à grande vitesse des données 3D graphiques basées sur des images de profondeur | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY] - BAYAKOVSKI Y ET AL, "Depth image-based representations for static and animated 3D objects", PROCEEDINGS 2002 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 2002. ROCHESTER, NY, SEPT. 22 - 25, 2002, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020922), VOL. 2 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-7622-6, pages 25 - 28, XP010607501 [DX] 1,6,19,24,31 * abstract * * pages III-25, column L, line 1 - line 18 * * pages III-25, column R, line 7 - line 22 * * pages III-26, column L, line 1 - pages III-27, column L, line 28 * * pages III-27, column R, paragraph L - pages III-28, column L, line 3 * * Section 6. Conclusion * [Y] 2-5,7-11,20-23,25-27 | [DY] - SHADE J ET AL, "LAYERED DEPTH IMAGES", COMPUTER GRAPHICS, (199807), pages 231 - 242, XP000934297 [DY] 2-5,7-11,20-23,25-27 * abstract * * page 231, column R, line 40 - page 232, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 236, column L, line 20 - column R, line 31 * * page 237, column R, paragraph L - page 239, column L, line L * | [DA] - OLIVEIRA M M ET AL, "RELIEF TEXTURE MAPPING", COMPUTER GRAPHICS. SIGGRAPH 2000 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. NEW ORLEANS, LA, JULY 23 - 28, 2000, COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS. SIGGRAPH, NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20000723), ISBN 1-58113-208-5, pages 359 - 368, XP001003575 [DA] 1-31 * abstract * * page 359, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 360, column L, paragraph L - column R, line 17 * * page 361, column L, line 24 - column R, paragraph 1 * | [PX] - GYEONG JA JANG ET AL, "Depth image-based rendering of 3-D object on mobile device", INTELLIGENT SIGNAL PROCESSING AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, 2004. ISPACS 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF 2004 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEOUL, KOREA NOV. 18-19, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041118), ISBN 0-7803-8639-6, pages 630 - 633, XP010806126 [PX] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISPACS.2004.1439135 | [PX] - LEVKOVICH-MASLYUK L ET AL, "DEPTH IMAGE-BASED REPRESENTATION AND COMPRESSION FOR STATIC AND ANIMATED 3-D OBJECTS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200407), vol. 14, no. 7, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1032 - 1045, XP001198603 [PX] 1,10,19,26,31 * abstract * * page 1032, column L, line 1 - page 133, column R, line 19 * * page 1034, column R, paragraph L - page 1036, column R, paragraph 1 * * Section VI. Rendering * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2004.830676 |