EP1566794 - Dynamical systems approach to LCD overdrive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genesis Microchip, Inc. 2150 Gold Street Alviso, CA 95002 / US | [2005/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halfant, Matthew 1548 Alisal Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Brown, George Laurence, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Brown, George Laurence, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2005/34] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250745.6 | 09.02.2005 | [2005/34] | Priority number, date | US20040546608P | 20.02.2004 Original published format: US 546608 P | US20040985688 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: US 985688 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1566794 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1566794 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
G09G3/36 (EP,US);
F41B5/0052 (KR);
F41B5/1403 (KR);
G09G2320/0252 (EP,US);
G09G2340/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Title | German: | Dynamischer Systemansatz zum übersteuernden Betrieb einer LC Anzeige | [2005/34] | English: | Dynamical systems approach to LCD overdrive | [2005/34] | French: | Approche d'un système dynamique pour la commande survirée d'un affichage à cristaux liquides | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 07.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003137527 (LIN WEN-TSUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0014] - [0021]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003179175 (SHIGETA MITSUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0013] - [0024]; figure 1 *; | [A] - HAJIME NAKAMURA AND KAZUO SEKIYA ET AL, "51.1: Overdrive Method for Reducing Response Times of Liquid Crystal Displays", SDI 01 DIGEST, (20010501), vol. XXXII, page 1256, XP007007778 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - LEE B ET AL, "LATE-NEWS PAPER: LCDS: HOW FAST IS ENOUGH?", 2001 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. SAN JOSE, CA, JUNE 5 - 7, 2001, SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, SAN JOSE, CA : SID, US, (200106), VOL. 32, pages 1106 - 1109, XP001054118 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2003137527 |