EP1568756 - Conductivity improving additive for fuel oil compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sutkowski, Andrew C 17 Ravencroft Bicester Oxon, OX26 6YE / GB | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Capaldi, Michael Joseph, et al Infineum UK Limited Law Department P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Capaldi, Michael Joseph, et al Infineum UK Limited Law Department P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251006.2 | 22.02.2005 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | EP20040251003 | 24.02.2004 Original published format: EP 04251003 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568756 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/14 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
C10L1/146 (EP);
C10L1/238 (EP);
C10L1/2383 (EP);
C10L1/2475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Title | German: | Leitfähigkeitsverbesserndes Additiv für Brennstoffölzusammensetzungen | [2005/35] | English: | Conductivity improving additive for fuel oil compositions | [2005/35] | French: | Additif pour améliorer la conductivité des compositions d'huiles combustibles | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US3917466 (HENRY JR CYRUS PERSHING) [XD] 10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-9; | [Y]US5089028 (ABRAMO GUY P [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 26; claims 1,3 *; | [A]US5254138 (KUREK PAUL R [US]) [A] 1-10* column 3, line 16 - line 30; example 1 *; | [XDY]US5672183 (SCHIELD JOHN A [US]) [XD] 10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-9; | [XDY]US2001048099 (SCHIELD JOHN A [US]) [XD] 10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-9 |