EP1574255 - Modified Mo-V-Nb-based metal oxide catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavalcanti, Fernando Antonio Pessoa 3073 Mitchell Court Lafayette Hill Pennsylvania 19444 / US | 02 /
Chaturvedi, Sanjay 1116 Highpoint Circle Lansdale Pennsylvania 19446 / US | 03 /
Gaffney, Anne Mae 805 Copeland School Road West Chester Pennsylvania 19380 / US | 04 /
Han, Scott 39 Easton Court Lawrenceville New Jersey 08648 / US | 05 /
Song, Ruozhi 101 Blue Rock Road Wilmington, Delaware, 19809 / US | 06 /
Vickery, Elsie Mae 500 West Avenue, A3 Jenkintown, Pennsylvania, 19046 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Patent Department 28th Floor, City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251201.9 | 28.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | US20040551820P | 10.03.2004 Original published format: US 551820 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1574255 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1574255 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/00, B01J37/06, B01J23/28, B01J27/057, B01J23/652, C07C51/215, C07C51/25, C07C67/03 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B65H35/008 (KR);
B01J23/28 (EP,US);
B01J23/6525 (EP,US);
B01J27/0576 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J37/0036 (EP,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,US);
B01J37/06 (EP,US);
B65H35/002 (KR);
C07C51/215 (EP,US);
C07C51/252 (EP,US);
B01J23/6484 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US);
B01J37/0236 (EP,US);
B01J37/34 (EP,US);
B65H2301/5151 (KR);
B65H2301/51532 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C51/215, C07C57/04 (EP,US);
C07C51/252, C07C57/04 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/55, B01J2523/56, B01J2523/64, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/824 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/50] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Modifizierte, auf Mo-V-Nb basierende Metalloxid-Katalysatoren | [2005/37] | English: | Modified Mo-V-Nb-based metal oxide catalysts | [2005/37] | French: | Catalyseurs modifiés à base d'un oxyde de Mo-V-Nb | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 13.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 01.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0857319 ; | [X]US4419270 (UESHIMA MICHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * claim 1 * * column 6, line 41 - line 52 * * examples 21,33 *; | [X]EP0608838 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-14 * examples 3,8 *; | [X]US6080882 (MIDORIKAWA HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 1,2 * * column 7, line 56 *; | [X]EP1193240 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0048] - [0053] - [0063] , [0080] , [0081]; example - *; | [X]EP1254707 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] * * example 1 *; | [X]WO03039745 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [X] 1-14 * claim - * * page 3, line 22 - line 30 * * page 4, line 19 * * page 11, line 7 - line 18 * * example -; tables 1,5 *; | [A]US2003144539 (MAMEDOV EDOUARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * example 8 *; | [XP]EP1407819 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [XP] 1-14 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0039] - [0042] ** example 2 *; | [E]EP1531001 (ROHM & HAAS [US], et al) [E] 1-14 * example - *; | [X] - UEDA W ET AL, Selective oxidation of light alkanes over hydrothermally synthesized Mo-V-M-O (M=Al, Ga, Bi, Sb, and Te) oxide catalysts, APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, PAGE(S) 135-143, (20000828), ISSN 0926-860X, XP004272455 [X] 1-14 * page 137, column L * * page 142, column L * * table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0926-860X(00)00627-X | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08057319 A 19960305 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-14 * abstract * |