EP1571804 - Method and apparatus for secure contents transfer and copyright protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isozaki, Hiroshi, c/o Int. Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Saito, Takeshi, c/o Int. Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Matsushita, Tatsuyuki, c/o Int. Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kamibayashi, Tooru, c/o Int. Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251314.0 | 04.03.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | JP20040063000 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004063000 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571804 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1571804 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571804 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/28, H04Q7/38 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | H04L29/06, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/29] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur sicheren Übertragung von Inhalten mit Urheberschutz | [2005/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for secure contents transfer and copyright protection | [2005/36] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la transmission de contenus sécurisée et la protection du droit d'auteur | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 09.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002157002 (MESSERGES THOMAS S [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0072] ** figures 2,4,9,10 *; | [A]US2004039906 (OKA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0158] - [0168] * * paragraphs [0196] - [0218] * * paragraphs [0255] - [0392] * * figures 1,8,9,13-16,21-38 * |