Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
03.08.2007 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.05.2007 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.02.2007 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
22.12.2006 | Change - applicant | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] |
06.10.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
03.08.2006 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.05.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
31.03.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.03.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
05.08.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |