EP1578056 - Supplying power remotely to multiple devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engel, Glenn R. 3227-139th Avenue SE Snohomish, WA 98290 / US | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS POWELL Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251335.5 | 07.03.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | US20040801328 | 15.03.2004 Original published format: US 801328 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1578056 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/10 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H04L12/10 (EP,US);
H04L12/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fernstromversorgung für mehere Geräte | [2005/38] | English: | Supplying power remotely to multiple devices | [2005/38] | French: | Alimentation à distance de plusieurs dispositifs | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/52] | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0964551 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0030] - [0033] - [0037]; figures 1-5; claims 1-10 *; | [X]DE10124691 (BKTEL COMM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0013] , [0015] , [0028] - [0031]; figures 2-5; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE10209339 (TENOVIS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9* abstract *; | [X]US6643566 (LEHR AMIR [IL], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract * * column 6, line 25 - column 8, line 20; figures 2a,2b *; | [A] - SIKORA A, "ERWEITERUNGEN FUER DAS ETHERNET RAPID SPANNING TREE, POWER OVER ETHERNET UND ETHERNET IN THE FIRST MILE, 2. TEIL", ELEKTRONIK, WEKA FACHZEITSCR.-VERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (20030916), vol. 52, no. 19, ISSN 0013-5658, pages 44 - 48, XP001171108 [A] 1,9 * the whole document * |