EP1577820 - Control of document disclosure according to affiliation or document type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Masako 320-2-302, Nakayamacho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251416.3 | 09.03.2005 | [2005/38] | Priority number, date | JP20040072665 | 15.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004072665 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577820 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/24] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerung der Dokumentfreigabe entsprechend Verbindung oder Dokumentart | [2005/38] | English: | Control of document disclosure according to affiliation or document type | [2005/38] | French: | Contrôle de révélation de document selon d'affiliation ou le type de document | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 28.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |