Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7322807 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2008 | B2 | US2006233655 | 19.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80042804 | 15.03.2004 | US45164506 | 13.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7070401 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2006 | B2 | US2005201883 | 15.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80042804 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1577558 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2012 | B1 | EP1577558 | 28.09.2005 | A3 | EP1577558 | 21.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US80042804 | 15.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100485165C | 06.05.2009 | C | CN1670335 | 21.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US80042804 | 15.03.2004 |