EP1580976 - Image processing apparatus, image data generation and transmission method and image data generation and transmission program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohyama, Maki c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Kawamoto, Hiroyuki c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Ohkawa, Satoshi c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Sugiyama, Naoki Obu-shataku, Room 711 Nadaka 1-5, Yokone-machi Obu-city Aichi Prefecture 474-0011 / JP | 05 /
Hiroshi, Arai c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
Shirata, Yasunobu c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 07 /
Togami, Atsushi c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 08 /
Tone, Takeharu c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 09 /
Nishita, Taira Kuresanto-shoin Room 105 Yakabayashi 3-30-10 Setagaya-ku Tokyo 154-0023 / JP | 10 /
Miyamoto, Isao c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251571.5 | 16.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | JP20040080637 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004080637 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1580976 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1580976 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/327, H04N1/40, H04N1/405, H04N1/407, H04N1/409, H04N1/41, H04N1/60 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
H04N1/40068 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00347 (EP,US);
H04N1/00413 (EP,US);
H04N1/00482 (EP,US);
H04N1/00795 (EP,US);
H04N1/00811 (EP,US);
H04N1/00822 (EP,US);
H04N1/32771 (EP,US);
H04N1/32776 (EP,US);
H04N1/40 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0027 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0039 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0065 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0075 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0081 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0091 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0093 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0094 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/39] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/52] |
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Verfahren und Programm zur Erzeugung und Übertragung von Bilddaten | [2005/39] | English: | Image processing apparatus, image data generation and transmission method and image data generation and transmission program | [2005/39] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images, méthode de génération et de transmission de données d'images et programme de génération et de transmission de données d'images | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 14.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2012 | 11.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/39] | 21.05.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 27.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1052843 (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 3-5,18-20 * figures 3,6 *; | [Y]US6243500 (KAWAMOTO HIROYUKI [JP]) [Y] 9,24-27 * figure 4 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 29 *; | [Y]US2002012453 (HASHIMOTO YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 11,24-27 * paragraph [0239] *; | [Y]US2002044298 (KANEKO SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,8,17,24-27 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0092] *; | [XYI]US2002048046 (UNNO KOUICHI [JP]) [X] 1,14,16,21 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,7-9,11,17-20,23-27 [I] 2,6,8,10,12-13,15-17,22,25-27; | [Y]US2003067626 (OHMORI MASATAKE [JP], et al) [Y] 7-8,23-27 * figures 1,4-8 * * paragraph [0055] *; | [Y]US2003184803 (YAMADA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 3-5,18-20 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0138] *; | [IPY]EP1404104 (RICOH KK [JP]) [IP] 1-8,10-23,25-27 * the whole document *[Y] 9,24 |