EP1583073 - Audio generating method and apparatus based on motion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Eun-seok 102-302 Hogye Hyundai Apt. Hogye 2-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyenggi-do / KR | 02 /
Oh, Jong-koo, Samsung Advanced Inst. of Technology San 14-1 Nongseo-ri Giheung-eub Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Dong-yoon, 101-501 Jinheung Apt. 459 Hongeun 3-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Bang, Won-chul 201, 129-7 Bundang-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Cho, Joon-kee 102-1403 Dongseong Apt. Giheung-eub Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Cho, Sung-jung, 249-403 Hwanggol Maeul 2-danji Apt Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Chang, Wook 28-30 Nonhyeon-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 08 /
Kang, Kyoung-ho, 305-105 Geumhwa Maeul Jugong Apt. Sanggal-ri Giheung-eub Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251758.8 | 22.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | KR20040020763 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: KR 2004020763 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1583073 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
G10H1/0008 (EP,US);
G06V10/46 (KR);
G10H2220/395 (EP,US);
G10H2220/401 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur bewegungsbezogenen Erzeugung von Audio | [2005/40] | English: | Audio generating method and apparatus based on motion | [2005/40] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la génération audio basée sur le mouvement | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 03.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/30] | 03.03.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5541358 (WHEATON JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 60 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, line 5 - column 7, line 38 *; | [A]EP1130570 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10,14-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0078] - [0108] ** paragraphs [0048] - [0050] *; | [X]US2002026866 (NISHITANI YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] - [0048] *; | [A]US2003045274 (NISHITANI YOSHIKI [JP]) [A] 1,8,10-13,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] - [0059] *; | [X] - SAWADA H ET AL, "GESTURE RECOGNITION USING AN ACCELERATION SENSOR AND ITS APPLICATION TO MUSICAL PERFORMANCE CONTROL", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART III - FUNDAMENTAL ELECTRONIC SCIENCE, SCRIPTA TECHNICA. NEW YORK, US, (199705), vol. 80, no. 5, ISSN 1042-0967, pages 9 - 17, XP000734426 [X] 1-19 * abstract * * Section 2: Acceleration Sensors and Feature Parameters Section 3: Gesture Recognition Section 4. Performance Control * * figures 1-6; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6440(199705)80:5<9::AID-ECJC2>3.0.CO;2-J | [A] - VERPLAETSE C, "INERTIAL PROPRIOCEPTIVE DEVICES: SELF-MOTION-SENSING TOYS AND TOOLS", IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL, IBM CORP. ARMONK, NEW YORK, US, (1996), vol. 35, no. 3/4, ISSN 0018-8670, pages 639 - 650, XP000635092 [A] 1-19 * Sections: Example proprioceptive applications Bats, racket, and batons Inertial Measurement System Accelerometers Gyroscopes * * figures 1-5; tables 2,3 * |