EP1582745 - Pump and ink jet printer mounting the pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takagi, Osamu, c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251795.0 | 23.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040085430 | 23.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004085430 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582745 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582745 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582745 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/00, F04C2/344, B41J2/175 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
F04C15/0049 (EP,US);
F01C21/08 (EP,US);
F04C2/3441 (EP,US);
F04C2220/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/25] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pumpe und damit versehener Tintenstrahldrucker | [2005/40] | English: | Pump and ink jet printer mounting the pump | [2005/40] | French: | Pompe et imprimante à jet d' encre associée | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 13.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59182743 ; | [A]US4333088 (DIGGINS MARTIN J) [A] 1,6,7 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 39; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5634783 (BEAL ARNOLD J [US]) [Y] 1,4 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 20; figures 2,5 *; | [Y]EP0933532 (ASUKA JAPAN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,4 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10130953 (LUK FAHRZEUG HYDRAULIK [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 48; figures 3-4c *; | [AP]EP1454755 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850222), vol. 009, no. 042, Database accession no. (M - 359), & JP59182743 A 19841017 (RICOH KK) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | by applicant | US5634783 | EP1454755 | JP2004268272 | JP2004270455 |