EP1583380 - Call encryption in a TETRA network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2005/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pedersen, Kristian Gronkjaer Dalso Park 72 Vaerlose Denmark 3500 / DK | 02 /
Pappas, Scott J. 1161 Centoni Drive Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US | 03 /
Langham, Timothy M. 1931 Prairie Square 328 Schaumburg Illinois 60173 / US | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251869.3 | 24.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | US20040555906P | 24.03.2004 Original published format: US 555906 P | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1583380 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1583380 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583380 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/12, H04Q7/28, H04Q7/38, H04L29/06, H04Q7/32 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
H04L9/12 (EP);
H04L9/0656 (EP);
H04W12/03 (EP);
H04W84/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/40] | H04Q7/28, H04Q7/38, H04L29/06, H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Title | German: | Anrufverschlüsselung in einem TETRA Netz | [2005/40] | English: | Call encryption in a TETRA network | [2005/40] | French: | Encryptage d'un appel dans un réseau TETRA | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 27.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.05.2007 | BE | 23.05.2007 | CH | 23.05.2007 | CY | 23.05.2007 | CZ | 23.05.2007 | DK | 23.05.2007 | EE | 23.05.2007 | FI | 23.05.2007 | IT | 23.05.2007 | LI | 23.05.2007 | LT | 23.05.2007 | NL | 23.05.2007 | PL | 23.05.2007 | RO | 23.05.2007 | SI | 23.05.2007 | SK | 23.05.2007 | TR | 23.05.2007 | BG | 23.08.2007 | SE | 23.08.2007 | GR | 24.08.2007 | ES | 03.09.2007 | IS | 23.09.2007 | PT | 23.10.2007 | HU | 24.11.2007 | FR | 18.01.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2009/45] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CY | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LT | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
FR | 18.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LT | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
FR | 18.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LT | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
FR | 18.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LT | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LT | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LT | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LT | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
PL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
IS | 23.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002066013 (RELANDER RASMUS [FI], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0051] *; | [A]US2003188148 (LOGALBO ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0049] *; | [AD] - "Terrestrial Trunked Radio (TETRA); Security; Synchronization mechanism for end-to-end encryption; ETSI EN 302 109", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200310), vol. TETRA-6, no. V111, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014015351 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * |