EP1582810 - Cylindrical burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rinnai Corporation 2-26, Fukuzumi-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 454-0802 / JP | [2013/30] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Rinnai Corporation 2-26, Fukuzumi-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 454-0802 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tachi, Misako, c/o Rinnai Corporation 2-26, Fukuzumi-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 454-0802 / JP | 02 /
Takasu, Yoshihiko, c/o Rinnai Corporation 2-26, Fukuzumi-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 454-0802 / JP | [2013/30] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
Tachi, Misako, c/o Rinnai Corporation 2-26, Fukuzumi-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 454-0802 / JP | ||
02 /
Takasu, Yoshihiko, c/o Rinnai Corporation 2-26, Fukuzumi-cho, Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 454-0802 / JP | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2013/30] |
Former [2009/48] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2005/40] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251921.2 | 29.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040096337 | 29.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004096337 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582810 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582810 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582810 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/02, F23D14/46 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
F23D14/02 (EP);
F23D14/46 (EP);
F23D2203/1012 (EP);
F23D2203/102 (EP);
F23D2212/10 (EP);
F23D2213/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2012/33] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zylinderförmiger Brenner | [2005/40] | English: | Cylindrical burner | [2005/40] | French: | Brûleur cylindrique | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 09.06.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62125208 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]WO9416269 (LE MER JOSEPH [FR]) [Y] 1 * page 12, line 5 - line 33; figures 15-17 *; | [A]EP0685687 (GRAAT JOHANNES WILHELMUS [NL]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 15 - line 19 * * column 4, line 44 - line 51 * * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]DE19627103 (SCHWANK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 19 - line 45 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 21 * * figures 1,7-11 * [A] 2-4; | [A]DE19813897 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 32 - line 45; figures 1-5 * |