EP1582169 - Medical device package with deformable retaining projections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifescan Scotland Ltd Beechwood Park North Inverness, IV2 3ED, Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Lifescan Scotland Ltd Beechwood Park North Inverness Inverness-shire IV2 3ED / GB | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Inverness Medical Limited Beechwood Park North Inverness Inverness-shire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, David K. Kin-Brae House 36 Culduthel Road Inverness Inverness-shire IV2 4AP / GB | 02 /
Sansom, Gordon G. Antfield House Scaniport Inverness Inverness-shire IV2 6DN / GB | 03 /
Pugh, Jerry 435 Rhone Court Mountain View California 94043 / US | 04 /
Windus-Smith, Bryan 21 Knochomie Gardens Forres Moray Inverness-Shire IV36 2TN / GB | 05 /
Day, Emma Vanessa Jayne Whinhill Cottage Cawdor Nairn IV12 5RF / GB | 06 /
Eldin, Gregory Jean Paul 59 Chemin du Puits 01390 Tramoyes / FR | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/40] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252014.5 | 31.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | US20040816002 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: US 816002 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1582169 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1582169 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/02, A61B5/15 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
A61B50/3001 (EP,US);
G01B21/20 (KR);
G01B5/0002 (KR);
G01B5/20 (KR);
A61B2050/3008 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/40] | A61B19/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Title | German: | Verpackung für eine medizinische Vorrichtung mit deformierbarem Haltevorsprung | [2005/40] | English: | Medical device package with deformable retaining projections | [2005/40] | French: | Emballage pour dispositif médical avec des éléments de retenue déformables | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4294355 (JEWUSIAK STEPHEN J, et al) [X] 1-3,6-12,14-16,20-26 * column 2, lines 42-66 * * column 3, lines 17-24; figure - * [Y] 17-19; | [X]US5046611 (OH SEIK [US]) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,12,14,20,21 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 21; figure - *; | [X]US5363958 (HORAN ROBERT T [US]) [X] 1-3,7-10,12,20,21* the whole document *; | [Y]US5875532 (MUSGRAVE ALFORD D [US], et al) [Y] 17-19 * column 3, lines 9-12; figure - *; | [X]US2002017472 (WEISSHAUPT DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,12,13,20,21 * paragraphs [0033] - [0043]; figure - * | by applicant | WO0164105 | WO0249507 | WO03015627 |