EP1587306 - Image processing apparatus and corresponding method for correcting optical distortions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwai, Yoshio 492-308 Minosho-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara 639-1103 / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Katsuji 3-1-28-N312 Yamamotochokita Yao-shi Osaka 581-0831 / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Takuji 1-10-403 1-chome Aoyama Nara-shi Nara 630-8101 / JP | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252288.5 | 13.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | JP20040122219 | 16.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004122219 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1587306 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1587306 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/217 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
H04N23/81 (EP,US);
E05D5/06 (KR);
E05D3/02 (KR);
H04N25/61 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/40] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und dazugehöriges Verfahren zur Korrektur von optischen Verzerrungen | [2005/42] | English: | Image processing apparatus and corresponding method for correcting optical distortions | [2005/42] | French: | Dispositif de prise de vue et méthode correspondante de corrrection de distorsions optiques | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000125174 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]US2003020732 (JASA TOMISLAV [CA], et al); | [L]US6937282 (SOME MASATO [JP], et al); |