EP1588767 - Chemical arrays and methods of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306-2024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peck, Bill J 1335 Montecito avenue No 47 Mountain View CA 9443 / US | 02 /
LeProust, Eric M 960 Goodacre Way 1543 San Jose CA 95125 / US | 03 /
Adaskin, David R Calinoma Drive San Jose CA 95118 / US | 04 /
Chen, Guang 1153 Huntington Drive San Jose CA 95129 / US | 05 /
Chesk, Williams G 1687 Almond Blossom Lane San Jose CA 95124 / US | 06 /
Schremp, Donald J 1915 Somersworth Drive San Jose CA 95124 / US | 07 /
Woods, Stanley P 1198 Elmsford Drive Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Barth, Daniel Mathias, et al Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Hewlett-Packard-Strasse 8 76337 Waldbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Barth, Daniel Mathias, et al Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Kurz, Peter, et al Agilent Technologies SARL Rue de la Gare 29 1110 Morges / CH | ||
Former [2005/43] | Jehan, Robert Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252450.1 | 19.04.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | US20040828357 | 19.04.2004 Original published format: US 828357 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1588767 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1588767 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02, B01J19/00, B41J2/04 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B01L3/0268 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00378 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00529 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00603 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00695 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00725 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
C40B40/10 (EP,US);
C40B60/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/43] | B01L3/02, B01J19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chemische Arrays und Verfahren deren Herstellung | [2005/43] | English: | Chemical arrays and methods of producing the same | [2005/43] | French: | Reseaux chimiques et leur procédé de fabrication | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4216483 (KYSER EDMOND L [US], et al) [X] 7-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 14 *; | [X]US5124716 (ROY JOY [US], et al) [X] 7 * abstract * * column 6, line 7 - line 28 *; | [A]US5843662 (DEAN ALAN [US], et al) [A] 7* figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1209467 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 7 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0020]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2003040107 (HIROTA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 7-10 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0127]; figures 14A,14B; claim 9 * |