EP1588744 - Exercise apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bowman, Simon Alan 3 Yonder Mount. Musbury Axminster, Devon EX13 6TR / GB | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Brown, Michael Stanley Alpha & Omega Chine Croft East Hill Ottery St. Mary, Devon EX11 1PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Brown, Michael Stanley Alpha and Omega, Chine Croft, East Hill Ottery St. Mary Devon EX11 1PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252475.8 | 20.04.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | GB20040008807 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: GB 0408807 | GB20040025797 | 24.11.2004 Original published format: GB 0425797 | GB20050004053 | 26.02.2005 Original published format: GB 0504053 | GB20050004323 | 03.03.2005 Original published format: GB 0504323 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1588744 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63B23/12, A63B21/068, A63B22/20 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
A63B23/12 (EP);
A63B21/068 (EP);
A63B21/169 (EP);
A63B21/4035 (EP);
A63B21/4047 (EP);
A63B22/20 (EP);
A63B23/03533 (EP);
A63B2071/025 (EP);
A63B21/00047 (EP);
A63B21/0085 (EP);
A63B21/04 (EP);
A63B21/05 (EP);
A63B21/0628 (EP);
A63B2208/0214 (EP);
A63B2208/0295 (EP);
A63B2210/50 (EP);
A63B23/0205 (EP);
A63B23/03541 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Title | German: | Übungsgerät | [2005/43] | English: | Exercise apparatus | [2005/43] | French: | Appareil d'exercice | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2010 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 28.06.2010 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 07.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.07.2007 | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.2009 | 30.04.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4684125 (LANTZ INGVAR [SE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 6, line 22 - line 43; figure 9 * [Y] 3,7; | [Y]US5518483 (OSWALD JOHN C [US]) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 13 - line 18 * * column 5, line 5 - line 16; figure - *; | [Y]US5597375 (SIMONSON ROY [US]) [Y] 7 * column 7, line 33 - line 37; figure 2 *; | [X]US5755649 (BIMBY MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US6190293 (SCHUYLER RICHARD DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 17 - line 51; figures 8a-9 * |