EP1603026 - Disk array device and battery output control method for disk array device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Katsunori, Hitachi, Ltd. IP Group, Marunoucho Bldg., 12F, 1-6-14 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Holt, Daniel Richard, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Holt, Daniel Richard, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252535.9 | 22.04.2005 | [2005/49] | Priority number, date | JP20040164007 | 02.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004164007 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1603026 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1603026 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1603026 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F1/00, G06F1/26, G06F1/30, G06F1/32, G11B33/12, H02J1/10 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
G06F11/1441 (EP,US);
G06F1/263 (EP,US);
G06F1/305 (EP,US);
G06F1/3221 (EP,US);
G11B33/126 (EP,US);
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | G06F3/06, G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/48] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Speicherplattenanordnung und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Batterieausgangs für Speicherplattenanordnung | [2005/49] | English: | Disk array device and battery output control method for disk array device | [2005/49] | French: | Dispositif de réseau de disques et procédé de gestion de sortie de batterie pour dispositif de réseau de disques | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5675816 (HIYOSHI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 11, lines 27-47 * * column 12, lines 4-21 * * column 13, lines 19-50 * * column 14, lines 8-17 * * column 14, lines 45-54 * * figures 1,4A,5A *; | [A]US2001046118 (YAMANASHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1,16 * paragraphs [0047] , [0053] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2003085622 (HAILEY JEFFREY C [US]) [A] 1,16 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] * * figures 4,5 *; | [Y]EP1320167 (MAGNETEK SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0012] * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1361516 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,16 * paragraphs [0016] - [0020] *; | [A]US2004068670 (SUZUKI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,16 * paragraphs [0022] , [0053] * * figure 1 *; | [A] - BENINI L ET AL, "Discharge current steering for battery lifetime optimization", LOW POWER ELECTRONICS AND DESIGN, 2002. ISLPED '02. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2002 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON AUG. 12-14, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020812), ISBN 1-58113-475-4, pages 118 - 123, XP010600865 [A] 1,16 * page 118, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 118, column R, paragraph 4 - page 119, column L, paragraph 1 * |