EP1601195 - A system and method for providing scheduled live off disk recording for DVR devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bontempi, Raymond C. 2097 Sturbridge Drive Jamison, PA 18929 / US | 02 /
Folk, Robert H. 523 N. Wynnewood Avenue Narberth, PA 19072 / US | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Schley, Jan Malte, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2005/48] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252561.5 | 25.04.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | US20040852361 | 24.05.2004 Original published format: US 852361 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1601195 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1601195 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Title | German: | Ein System und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von ablaufgesteuerter zeitversetzter Scheibenaufnahme für DVR-Geräte | [2005/48] | English: | A system and method for providing scheduled live off disk recording for DVR devices | [2005/48] | French: | Un système et procédé permettant l'enregistrement de disque programmé différé pour appareils DVR | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 05.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0058967 (TIVO INC [US]) [X] 1-23 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 28, paragraph 5 - page 29, paragraph 2 * * page 31, paragraph 3 - page 34, paragraph 1 *; | [XI]US2003067886 (SON HYEONG HO [KR], et al) [X] 1,8,12,16 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * [I] 2-7,9-11,13-15,17-23; | [I]WO03041387 (UCENTRIC HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-23 * page 10, paragraph 3 ** page 12, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 3 * |