EP1600349 - Bearing unit for railway carriages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2009/35] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states NTN CORPORATION 3-17 Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Shiro, c/o NTN Corporation 3066 Aza Oyumida Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi Mie-ken / JP | 02 /
Miki, Daisuke, c/o NTN Corporation 3066 Aza Oyumida Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi Mie-ken / JP | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252616.7 | 27.04.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | JP20040153905 | 24.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004153905 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600349 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1600349 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B61F15/22, F16C19/38, F16C33/76 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
B61F15/22 (EP,US);
F16C19/386 (EP,US);
F16C33/768 (EP,US);
F16C33/7813 (EP,US);
F16C35/063 (EP,US);
F16C2326/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/31] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lagereinheit für Reisezugwagen | [2005/48] | English: | Bearing unit for railway carriages | [2005/48] | French: | Unité palier pour voitures ferroviaires | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 31.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3041091 (BAYERL JOSEPH J) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 69; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4997294 (HILLMANN REINHART [DE]) [A] 1* column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 63; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6561559 (SKILLER JOHN VINCENT [NL], et al) [A] 1,6-10 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2001027254 | JP2001354136 |