EP1662688 - Mobile communicaton system with adaptive modulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murata, Syuuichi FJ Mobile Core Techno. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Atsushi Fujitsu LSI Technology Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 03 /
Niimi, Junichi Fujitsu LSI Technology Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 04 /
Matusaki, Takahiro Fujitsu LSI Technology Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 05 /
Otonari, Akihide Fujitsu Network Techno. Ltd. 9-18, Shinyokohama 3-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | 06 /
Araikawa, Yuka Fujitsu Network Techno. Ltd. 9-18, Shinyokohama 3-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | 01 /
Murata, Syuuichi, FJ Mobile Core Techno. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Tanaka, Atsushi, Fujitsu LSI Technology Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | |||
03 /
Niimi, Junichi, Fujitsu LSI Technology Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | |||
04 /
Matusaki, Takahiro, Fujitsu LSI Technology Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | |||
05 /
Otonari, Akihide, Fujitsu Network Techno. Ltd. 9-18, Shinyokohama 3-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | |||
06 /
Araikawa, Yuka, Fujitsu Network Techno. Ltd. 9-18, Shinyokohama 3-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | Representative(s) | Schultes, Stephan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2013/21] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2006/22] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al HASELTINE LAKE Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252734.8 | 03.05.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | JP20040340556 | 25.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004340556 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1662688 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1662688 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L1/16 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
H04L1/0016 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/1628 (EP,US);
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/43] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobilkommunikationssystem mit adaptiver Modulation | [2006/22] | English: | Mobile communicaton system with adaptive modulation | [2006/22] | French: | Système de communication mobile avec modulation adaptative | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 24.08.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.09.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0899906 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]WO2004084452 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 10, line 16 - page 18, line 14; figures 3-6 * | Examination | US2002147953 | EP1289179 | EP1388966 |