EP1594072 - A system and method for GUI supported specifications for automating form field extraction with database mapping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Corporation 170 Wood Avenue South Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | [2010/35] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS CORPORATE RESEARCH, INC. 755 College Road East Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Peiya 39 Davidson Avenue East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 02 /
Palanivelu, Sridharan 3616 Ravens Crest Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 03 /
Hsu, Liang H. 55 Fire Thorn Irvine, CA 92620 / US | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Wheatley, Alison Clare, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2013/31] |
Former [2008/39] | Clarke, Alison Clare, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Chamberlain, Alan James, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2005/45] | Vigars, Christopher Ian HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay, 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252798.3 | 06.05.2005 | [2005/45] | Priority number, date | US20040568809P | 06.05.2004 Original published format: US 568809 P | US20050122867 | 05.05.2005 Original published format: US 122867 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1594072 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1594072 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1594072 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
G06F16/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/33] |
Former [2005/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Methode für GUI-unterstützte Anweisungen zur automatischen Feld-Extraktion aus einem Formular mit Abbildung in eine Datenbank | [2005/45] | English: | A system and method for GUI supported specifications for automating form field extraction with database mapping | [2005/45] | French: | Système et appareil pour pour la spécification d'extraction de zones de formulaires et de représentation dans une base de données en utilisant un GUI | [2005/45] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Request for further processing for: | 05.06.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1143357 (VITRIA TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1253530 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003140055 (DONEY GARY CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0039] *; | [Y]WO03083700 (THOUGHT INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19* the whole document *; | [Y]WO03088032 (RSG SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 7 - page 24; figures 1,2,4-30 *; | [Y]US2004019693 (GROW JOHN DARWIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ALTOVA GMBH, MAPFORCE 2004 USER REFERENCE, United States of America, ISBN 0-9723-5595-2, (20040424), pages 67 - 102, URL: www.altova.com, (20051012), XP002349061 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [Y] - ALTOVA GMBH, STYLEVISION 2004 USER MANUAL, United States of America, ISBN 0-9723-5595-2, (20040424), pages 330 - 353, URL: www.altova.com, (20051012), XP002349062 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * |