EP1599052 - Imaging device, image processing method, and color area setting program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Une, Hideho, Intellectual Property Department Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Mills, Julia D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Mills, Julia D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252988.0 | 16.05.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | JP20040150165 | 20.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004150165 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1599052 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1599052 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60, // H04N9/73 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
H04N23/88 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | H04N9/73 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/24] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bildaufnahme und Farbbereichseinstellung | [2005/47] | English: | Imaging device, image processing method, and color area setting program | [2005/47] | French: | Procédé et appareil de prise d'image et réglage de l'espace chromatique | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5282024 (TAKEI HIROHUMI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - line 58 * * column 4, line 40 - line 63 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US5751349 (MATSUI SEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 29 - line 31 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 7 * * column 23, line 66 - column 24, line 5 * * figures 7,8,17 *; | [A]US5831672 (TAKEI HIROFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 11, line 47 - column 12, line 37 ** figures 14,15,17,20 * | Examination | JP2004040462 |