EP1609737 - Easy-open package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Shinichiro, Uni-Charm Corp. Tech. Center 1531-7 Takasaka Wadahama Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
Saito, Ikuya, Uni-Charm Corp. Tech. Center 1531-7 Takasaka Wadahama Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | 03 /
Sugiura, Sachi, Uni-Charm Corp. Tech. Center 1531-7 Takasaka Wadahama Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore LLP European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2005/52] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253455.9 | 04.06.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | JP20040185542 | 23.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004185542 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1609737 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1609737 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1609737 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/12, B65D75/58 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
B65D75/5838 (EP,US);
B65D83/08 (KR);
B65D77/30 (KR);
Y10S206/812 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Title | German: | Einfach zu öffnende Verpackung | [2005/52] | English: | Easy-open package | [2005/52] | French: | Emballage facile à ouvrir | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 28.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | CZ | 23.08.2006 | EE | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | LT | 23.08.2006 | PL | 23.08.2006 | RO | 23.08.2006 | SI | 23.08.2006 | SK | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | BG | 23.11.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | HU | 24.02.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LT | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LT | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LT | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LT | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
PL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5908246 (ARIMURA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6126009 (SHIFFLER BENJAMIN N [US], et al) [A] 1* column 4, lines 28-65; figures 1,2 * |