EP1607804 - Developing device methods of image forming and apparatus for image forming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Junichi Lalahills 3-502, Kita Yamada 7-4, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Iwata, Nobuo Higashi Ohnuma 4-4-20, Sagaihara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Muramatsu, Satoshi Okinomiya-cho 15-8 Edogawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takeuchi, Nobutaka Central Duo Ichigao 719, Eda Nishi 3-chome Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Koike, Takayuki Annex Kojima 311, Tsunashima Higashi 3-chome Kohhoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
Maruyama, Eriko Grand Comfort 16-202, Higashi Rinkan 4-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253808.9 | 20.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | JP20040180565 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004180565 | JP20050049206 | 24.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005049206 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1607804 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1607804 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
G03G15/0848 (EP,US);
G03B15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/08] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entwicklungsvorrichtung, Verfahren zur Bilderzeugung und Bilderzeugungsgerät | [2005/51] | English: | Developing device methods of image forming and apparatus for image forming | [2005/51] | French: | Appareil de développement , méthode de formation d'images et appareil de formation d'images | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 15.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60176070 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1,11 * abstract *; | [Y]US4711551 (FUJIO AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 28 * abstract * * column 1, lines 24-29,53-63 *; | [XA]US5227842 (HAYASHI KOUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 16 * * column 3, lines 25,26 * * column 9, lines 19-43 *[A] 22; | [X]JPH08106211 (CANON KK) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] *; | [Y]US5592270 (TAKAI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 29,30,36,38 * abstract * * column 1, lines 28-32,39-48 * * column 3, lines 16-20 * * column 9, lines 37-55 * * column 10, lines 1-7 * * column 15, lines 35-40,55-62 *; | [X]US5778279 (KAWAI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,22,24,25,39 * abstract * * column 1, lines 24-32 * * column 4, lines 30-47 * * column 5, lines 30-61 * * column 12, line 36 - column 13, line 38 *; | [XY]JPH1152724 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [X] 1-4,8-10,32-34,37,40 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0034] - [0038] * [Y] 28-30,36,38; | [PX]US2004151514 (SHUJI HIRAI [JP]) [PX] 1,11,18,19,22,23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0010] , [0026] - [0029] - [0037] * | by applicant | JPS5349439 | JPH0369006B | JPH09251235 | JP2779502B | JP2986001B | JP2000075629 | JP2000105498 | JP3466943B | JP2004184698 | JP2004180565 | JP2005049206 |