EP1739292 - A method of diagnosing the effectiveness of a catalytic device in the exhaust system of a multi-cylinder internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2007/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kern, Bernhard 9, op der Gare 8551 Noerdange / LU | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253996.2 | 28.06.2005 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739292 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1739292 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01N11/00 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
F01N11/007 (EP);
F01N2430/06 (EP);
F01N2550/02 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Feststellen der Wirksamkeit einer Katalysatorvorrichtung im Abgasstrang einer mehrzylindrigen Brennkraftmaschine | [2007/01] | English: | A method of diagnosing the effectiveness of a catalytic device in the exhaust system of a multi-cylinder internal combustion engine | [2007/01] | French: | Procédure de diagnostique de l'éfficacité d'un dispositif catalytique dans le système d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne multi-cylindres | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2005 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 17.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2008 | BE | 13.02.2008 | CY | 13.02.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | LT | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | PL | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | IS | 13.06.2008 | LU | 28.06.2008 | IE | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
LU | 28.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
LU | 28.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5018348 (DUERSCHMIDT FERRY [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0466311 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5,9 *; | [A]US5172320 (NADA MITSUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 40 - line 53 * * column 2, line 28 - line 38 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 27 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US6651422 (LEGARE JOSEPH E [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 14 ** figure 1 * |