EP1612523 - Thermal flow sensor having recesses in a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CODMAN & SHURTLEFF INC. 325 Paramount Drive Rynham, MA 02767 / US | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keppner, Herbert Rue de l'etang 2 2013 Colombier / CH | 02 /
Buser, Rudolf Muhlbachstrasse 31 9472 Grabs / CH | 03 /
Zumkehr, Frank Klopfermanttli 7 3174 Frutigen / CH | 04 /
Burger, Juergen Fluhackerweg 8 2563 Ipsach / CH | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/01] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254054.9 | 29.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | US20040881771 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: US 881771 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1612523 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1612523 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612523 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/684 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G01F1/6845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Thermischer Durchflussmesser mit Vertiefungen in einem Substrat | [2006/01] | English: | Thermal flow sensor having recesses in a substrate | [2006/01] | French: | Débitmètre thermique avec des évidements réalisés sur un substrat | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.03.2011 | 01.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Request for further processing for: | 14.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2005 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | DK | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | FI | 31.08.2011 | LT | 31.08.2011 | NL | 31.08.2011 | PL | 31.08.2011 | RO | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | TR | 31.08.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | IS | 31.12.2011 | PT | 02.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | BE | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | BE | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 31.08.2011 | |
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 31.08.2011 | |
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 31.08.2011 | |
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 31.08.2011 | |
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4616505 (JOUWSMA WIJBREN [NL]) [A] 1,8,18,25* abstract *; | [A]US5623097 (HORIGUCHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,18,25 * abstract *; | [Y]US6553829 (NAKADA KEIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * column 6, line 26 - line 65 *; | [A]WO03071384 (EUNOE INC [US]) [A] 1,8,18,25 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1365216 (YAMATAKE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-28 * abstract * * page 3 - page 4 * |