Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
27.11.2009 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
24.11.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
24.11.2009 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
24.07.2009 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
07.04.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.07.2008 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
09.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.03.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.06.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.03.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
20.01.2007 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
08.09.2006 | First examination report | |
06.09.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
04.08.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
02.12.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] |
19.11.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] |