EP1612049 - Image recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | ||
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Shingo, Technology Planning & IP Dept. Brother Kogyo K.K. 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
Sugiura, Toshio, Technology Planning & IP Dept. Brother Kogyo K.K. 1-1-1, Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254118.2 | 30.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | JP20040193884 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004193884 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612049 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612049 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17526 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildaufzeichnungsgerät | [2006/01] | English: | Image recording apparatus | [2006/01] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement d'image | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05162335 ; | [A]US5500664 (SUZUKI ETSUROU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0903239 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] * * figure 6 *; | [A]US6550899 (COWGER BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931013), vol. 017, no. 565, Database accession no. (M - 1495), & JP05162335 A 19930629 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2003300330 |