EP1615437 - Method and system for providing video-on-demand (VOD) services in a digital cable TV network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, In-chul 205-1902 LG Village 690 Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/48] |
Former [2006/02] | 01 /
Yu, In-chul 205-1902 LG Village 690 Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2019/48] |
Former [2006/14] | Clark, David James, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2006/02] | Brandon, Paul Laurence, et al APPLEYARD LEES, 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254120.8 | 30.06.2005 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | KR20040053084 | 08.07.2004 Original published format: KR 2004053084 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615437 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1615437 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H04N21/6581 (EP,US);
H04N21/2343 (KR);
H04N21/25816 (EP,US);
H04N21/25841 (EP,US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N21/64322 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2019/48] |
Former [2006/37] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Video-auf-Anfrage Dienstleistungen in einem digitalen Fernsehrundfunknetz | [2019/23] | English: | Method and system for providing video-on-demand (VOD) services in a digital cable TV network | [2006/02] | French: | Système et procédé de fourniture de services vidéo à la demande dans un réseau de television a diffusion numerique | [2006/02] |
Former [2006/02] | System und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Video-auf-Anfrage Dienstleistungen in einem digitalen Fernsehrundfunknetz | Examination procedure | 07.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 12.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | FR | 30.06.2020 | [2021/23] |
Former [2021/10] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
NL | 27.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02077808 (IMAGINE BROADBAND LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 1 * * page 36 - page 40; figure 26 *; | [X]US2003051250 (SUGIMOTO MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2004117816 (KARAOGUZ JEYHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * pages 1-3,6; figures 1-4 *; | [X] - PEKOWSKY STUART; JAEGER RUDOLF, "THE SET-TOP BOX AS "MULTI-MEDIA TERMINAL"", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19980801), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 833 - 840, XP002353732 [X] 1-21 * page 833 - page 835 * * page 837 - page 839 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.713202 | Examination | - DVB ORGANIZATION, "Abstract SI API Specification", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20031003), XP017818504 | by applicant | KR960706749 | WO9515658 | WO02077808 | KR20020090727 | US2003051250 | US2004117816 | - PEKOWSKY STUART; JAEGER RUDOLF, "THE SET-TOP BOX AS", MULTI-MEDIA TERMINAL IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19980801), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 833 - 840 |